WV SB237 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 32, Acts, Regular Session, 2008
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 32, Acts, Regular Session, 2008
Summary
Repealing county officers' annual report requirement of certain expenditures
Title
Repealing county officers' annual report requirement of certain expenditures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-08 | Chapter 32, Acts, Regular Session, 2008 | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/27/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/27/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-27 | Approved by Governor 3/27/08 | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/17/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/17/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-17 | To Governor 3/17/08 | |
2008-03-06 | House Message received | |
2008-03-05 | Completed legislative action | |
2008-03-05 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-03-05 | Passed House (Roll No. 288) | |
2008-03-05 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-03-05 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-03-04 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-03-04 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-03-03 | Read 1st time | |
2008-03-03 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2008-02-29 | 2nd reference dispensed | |
2008-02-29 | Do pass | |
2008-02-26 | To House Political Subdivisions | |
2008-02-26 | To Political Subdivisions then Finance | |
2008-02-26 | Introduced in House | |
2008-02-25 | Ordered to House | |
2008-02-25 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 7) | |
2008-02-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-02-25 | On 3rd reading | |
2008-02-22 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-22 | On 2nd reading | |
2008-02-21 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-21 | On 1st reading | |
2008-02-20 | Reported do pass | |
2008-01-31 | To Finance | |
2008-01-31 | Reported do pass, but first to Finance | |
2008-01-16 | To Government Organization | |
2008-01-16 | To Government Organization then Finance | |
2008-01-16 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-01-16 | To Government Organization then Finance | |
2008-01-16 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=237&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |