WV SB234 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-13 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-13 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to clarify the uniform statewide deadline for electronically submitted voter registration applications.
Title
Clarifying uniform statewide deadline for electronically submitted voter registration applications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-10 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 157) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 157) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 157) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-13 | House | To House Judiciary |
2023-02-13 | House | To Judiciary |
2023-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 157) |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 157) |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-10 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-09 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-02-08 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2023-01-16 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-01-16 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB3008 (Similar To) 2023-01-24 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 2 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |