WV SB222 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-09 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-09 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating criminal offense for interfering with emergency service call
Title
Creating criminal offense for interfering with emergency service call
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | To House Judiciary | |
2012-02-09 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2012-02-09 | Introduced in House | |
2012-02-08 | Ordered to House | |
2012-02-08 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) | |
2012-02-08 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-07 | Laid over on 3rd reading 2/7/12 | |
2012-02-07 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-02-06 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-06 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-02-03 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-03 | On 1st reading | |
2012-02-02 | Committee substitute reported | |
2012-01-17 | To Judiciary | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-01-17 | To Judiciary | |
2012-01-17 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4397 (Similar To) 2012-02-02 - To House Judiciary