WV SB208 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 189, Acts, Regular Session, 2008
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 189, Acts, Regular Session, 2008
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to clarify that all retirement systems administered by the Consolidated Public Retirement Board are included for employer pick-up provisions for federal tax purposes.
Title
Clarifying all Consolidated Public Retirement Board systems are included in employer pick-up provisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-08 | Chapter 189, Acts, Regular Session, 2008 | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/27/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/27/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-27 | Approved by Governor 3/27/08 | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/21/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-21 | To Governor 3/21/08 | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/21/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-08 | House Message received | |
2008-03-06 | Completed legislative action | |
2008-03-06 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-03-06 | Passed House (Roll No. 339) | |
2008-03-06 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-03-06 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-03-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-03-05 | From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2008-03-04 | Read 1st time | |
2008-03-04 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-03-04 | Do pass | |
2008-02-28 | To House Finance | |
2008-02-28 | Do pass, but first to Finance | |
2008-02-20 | To House Pensions and Retirement | |
2008-02-20 | To Pensions and Retirement then Finance | |
2008-02-20 | Introduced in House | |
2008-02-19 | Ordered to House | |
2008-02-19 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) | |
2008-02-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-02-19 | On 3rd reading | |
2008-02-18 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-18 | On 2nd reading | |
2008-02-15 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-15 | On 1st reading | |
2008-02-14 | Committee substitute reported | |
2008-01-24 | To Finance | |
2008-01-24 | Reported do pass, but first to Finance | |
2008-01-11 | To Pensions | |
2008-01-11 | To Pensions then Finance | |
2008-01-11 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-01-11 | To Pensions then Finance | |
2008-01-11 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4045 (Same As) 2010-01-19 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=208&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |