WV SB2005 | 2017 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-24 - Chapter 1, Acts, 2nd Extraordinary Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to provide payment to certain claimants who provided commodities and/or services to the state, but who were not paid because the agency reached its budget limit. Total amount from Special Revenue:Â $74,296.58

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Finding and declaring claim against state

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-17 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 702) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 701) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 700) (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 5) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 5) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 4) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-24SenateChapter 1, Acts, 2nd Extraordinary Session, 2017
2017-11-13SenateApproved by Governor 10/24/17 - Senate Journal
2017-10-24SenateApproved by Governor 10/24/17
2017-11-13SenateTo Governor 10/20/17 - Senate Journal
2017-10-20SenateTo Governor 10/20/17
2017-10-17SenateHouse Message received
2017-10-17HouseCompleted legislative action
2017-10-17HouseCommunicated to Senate
2017-10-17HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 702)
2017-10-17HousePassed House (Roll No. 701)
2017-10-17HouseRead 3rd time
2017-10-17HouseAmendment ruled not germane
2017-10-17HouseAmendment reported by the Clerk
2017-10-17HouseRead 2nd time
2017-10-17HouseDispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 700)
2017-10-17HouseRead 1st time
2017-10-17HouseImmediate consideration
2017-10-17HouseReference dispensed
2017-10-17HouseIntroduced in House
2017-10-17SenateOrdered to House
2017-10-17SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 5)
2017-10-17SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 5)
2017-10-17SenateRead 3rd time
2017-10-17SenateRead 2nd time
2017-10-17SenateConstitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 4)
2017-10-17SenateRead 1st time
2017-10-17SenateCommittee reference dispensed
2017-10-17SenateImmediate consideration
2017-10-17SenateIntroduced in Senate
2017-10-17SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB204 (Similar To) 2017-10-16 - To House Finance

Subjects


West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback