WV SB195 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 197, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 197, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to remove the expiration date for the tax rate on eligible acute care hospitals.
Title
Modifying tax rate expiration date on eligible acute care hospitals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-12 - House - Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 318) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 301) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 300) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 6) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 6) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 301) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 300) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 6) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 6) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | Senate | Chapter 197, Acts, Regular Session, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 4/30/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/30/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/30/13 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | To Governor 4/23/13 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 4/23/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 4/23/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-12 | House | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-12 | House | Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 318) |
2013-04-12 | House | House reconsidered effective date |
2013-04-12 | House | The bill still being in possession of the clerk |
2013-04-12 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 301) |
2013-04-12 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 300) |
2013-04-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-12 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-11 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-10 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-04-10 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-04-09 | House | Do pass |
2013-04-03 | House | To House Finance |
2013-04-03 | House | To Finance |
2013-04-03 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 6) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 6) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-03-29 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2013-03-15 | Senate | To Finance |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2013-02-18 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-02-18 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Finance |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2462 (Same As) 2013-02-14 - To House Health and Human Resources
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 27 | 38 | Amended Code | Citation Text |