WV SB187 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 196, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 196, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide for confidentiality of medical records for patients’ physical, mental or emotional conditions.
Title
Providing for confidentiality of patients' medical records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 436) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 424) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 423) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 117) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 424) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 423) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 117) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Chapter 196, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/25/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/25/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/25/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/20/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/20/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-20 | Senate | To Governor 4/20/17 |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 436) |
2017-04-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-06 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 424) |
2017-04-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-06 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 423) |
2017-04-06 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-04-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-04 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2017-03-16 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-03-16 | House | To Judiciary |
2017-03-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 117) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-15 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-14 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-13 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-11 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2017-02-17 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2017-02-08 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-02-08 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27 | 3 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |