WV SB186 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 74, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 74, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to adjust the date upon which children become eligible for certain school programs and school attendance requirements. The bill changes the kindergarten age attainment requirement from age five prior to September 1, to age five prior to July 1. The bill changes the early childhood education program age attainment date requirement from age four prior to September 1, to age four prior to July 1. The bill changes the age for which compulsory attendance begins to those who attain age six by July 1, of each year.
Title
Adjusting date when children become eligible for certain school programs and school attendance requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 354) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 345) (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 123) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 345) (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 123) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Chapter 74, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/18/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/18/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/18/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/13/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/13/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-13 | Senate | To Governor 4/13/17 |
2017-04-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 354) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-04 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 345) |
2017-04-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-04 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-03 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-03 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-04-01 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-31 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2017-03-31 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2017-03-17 | House | To House Education |
2017-03-17 | House | To Education then Finance |
2017-03-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 123) |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Motion to refer to Rules rejected |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-16 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-15 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-14 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported |
2017-03-01 | Senate | To Finance |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2017-02-08 | Senate | To Education |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-02-08 | Senate | To Education then Finance |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2478 (Similar To) 2017-02-15 - To House Education
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 5 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 5 | 44 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 8 | 1a | Amended Code | Citation Text |