WV SB172 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 140, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 140, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize trusts to be applicants for a nonintoxicating beer distributor license and to add limited liability companies to the definition of person in the Nonintoxicating Beer Act.
Title
Relating to nonintoxicating beer distributor licensees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 403) (Y: 87 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 105) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 105) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | Senate | Chapter 140, Acts, Regular Session, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 5/2/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/2/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/2/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 5/1/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 5/1/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-05-01 | Senate | To Governor 5/1/13 |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 105) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-13 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-04-13 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 403) |
2013-04-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-13 | House | Amended on 3rd reading |
2013-04-13 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2013-04-13 | House | Placed at foot of 3rd Reading |
2013-04-13 | House | On 3rd reading with restricted right to amend, Special Calender |
2013-04-12 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-04-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-12 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-11 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-04-11 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-04-10 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2013-04-08 | House | To House Finance |
2013-04-08 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2013-03-05 | House | To House Judiciary |
2013-03-05 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-04 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/28/13 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-02-27 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2013-02-15 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-02-15 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2448 (Similar To) 2013-02-14 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 16 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 16 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |