WV SB170 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB170

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-07 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Alleviating double taxation on foreign income at state level

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alleviating double taxation on foreign income at state level

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 5) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-07HouseOn 2nd reading, House Calendar
2020-02-14HouseFrom Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar
2020-02-13HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-12HouseRead 1st time
2020-02-12HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-11HouseWith amendment, do pass
2020-01-20HouseTo House Finance
2020-01-20HouseTo Finance
2020-01-20HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-17SenateOrdered to House
2020-01-17SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 5)
2020-01-17SenateRead 3rd time
2020-01-17SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-01-16SenateRead 2nd time
2020-01-16SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-01-15SenateRead 1st time
2020-01-15SenateOn 1st reading
2020-01-14SenateReported do pass
2020-01-09SenateTo Finance
2020-01-09SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-01-09SenateTo Finance
2020-01-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB170 (Carry Over) 2019-02-01 - Reported in Com. Sub. for S. B. 175

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
112120Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback