WV SB170 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-25 - Reported in Com. Sub. for S. B. 165
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-25 - Reported in Com. Sub. for S. B. 165
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
DHHR rule relating to development of methodologies to examine needs for substance use and disorder treatment facilities
Title
DHHR rule relating to development of methodologies to examine needs for substance use and disorder treatment facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-25 | Senate | Reported in Com. Sub. for S. B. 165 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2018-01-11 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-01-11 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4132 (Similar To) 2018-01-26 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |