WV SB170 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 31, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 31, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to repeal article 24 of chapter 16. This bill was recommended for passage during the 2017 Regular Session of the Legislature by the Legislative Oversight Committee on Health and Human Resources Accountability.
Title
Repealing state hemophilia program
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Ferns [R] | Sen. Ed Gaunch [R] | Sen. Tom Takubo [R] | Sen. Charles Trump [R] |
Sen. Roman Prezioso [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] | Sen. Craig Blair [R] |
Sen. Glenn Jeffries [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 342) (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Chapter 31, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/18/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/18/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/18/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/13/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/13/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-13 | Senate | To Governor 4/13/17 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-04 | House | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-04 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 342) |
2017-04-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-04 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-03 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-04-01 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-31 | House | Do pass |
2017-02-24 | House | To House Finance |
2017-02-24 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2017-02-16 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2017-02-16 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Finance |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-02-15 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-02-14 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-02-13 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-02-10 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2017-02-08 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-02-08 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Finance |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 24 | 1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
16 | 24 | 2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
16 | 24 | 3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
16 | 24 | 4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
16 | 24 | 5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
16 | 24 | 6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
16 | 24 | 7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |