WV SB159 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 119, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 119, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require that the party affiliation for county school board members be displayed beside their name on the ballot for election.
Title
Prohibiting persons convicted of certain crimes against minors from holding positions on boards of education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 481) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 651) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 602) (Y: 13 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2024-01-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 18) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 651) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 602) (Y: 13 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2024-01-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 18) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 119, Acts, Regular Session, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/24 - House Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/24 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/24 |
2024-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/19/24 - House Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-19 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 481) |
2024-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 651) |
2024-03-08 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-07 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 602) |
2024-03-07 | House | Amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2024-03-07 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-03-06 | House | Immediate consideration |
2024-03-07 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-06 | House | Do pass |
2024-01-15 | House | To House Judiciary |
2024-01-15 | House | To Judiciary |
2024-01-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 18) |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-01-12 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-01-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 5 | 1a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 5 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |