WV SB159 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-18 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-18 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating Real Property Transfer on Death Act
Title
Creating Uniform Real Property Transfer on Death Act
Sponsors
Sen. Gregory Tucker [D] | Sen. Truman Chafin [D] | Sen. David Nohe [R] | Sen. Corey Palumbo [D] |
Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] | Sen. Erik Wells [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-18 | House | To House Finance |
2013-03-18 | House | To Finance |
2013-03-18 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-15 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-14 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-03-13 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2013-02-14 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-02-14 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2488 (Same As) 2013-02-19 - To House Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 12 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 12 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 12 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 12 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 12 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 12 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 12 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 12 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 12 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 12 | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 12 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 12 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 12 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 12 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 12 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 12 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 12 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 12 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 12 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |