WV SB158 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 33, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 33, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creating Complete Streets Act
Title
Creating Complete Streets Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 236) (Y: 92 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | Senate | Chapter 33, Acts, Regular Session, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 4/19/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/19/13 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/19/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 4/15/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-15 | Senate | To Governor 4/15/13 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-10 | House | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 236) |
2013-04-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-10 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-09 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-08 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-04-08 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-04-05 | House | Do pass |
2013-03-27 | House | To House Government Organization |
2013-03-27 | House | To Government Organization |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-03-22 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported |
2013-03-14 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Government Organization |
2013-02-14 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-02-14 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure then Government Organization |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2494 (Same As) 2013-02-15 - To House Roads and Transportation
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 4A | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 4A | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 4A | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |