WV SB15 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-19 - To House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-19 - To House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to prohibit a classroom teacher from receiving the salary increase for any education level above A.B. plus 15 unless certain in-field master’s degree related requirements have been met.
Title
Relating generally to in-field master’s degree
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 15) (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-19 | House | To House Education |
2021-02-22 | House | To Education |
2021-02-19 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 15) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/16/21 |
2021-02-16 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-02-15 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-02-13 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2021-02-13 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2021-02-10 | Senate | To Education |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-10 | Senate | To Education then Finance |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18A | 4 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18A | 4 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |