WV SB12 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 152, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 152, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require employers pay outstanding wages due to separated employees to be by the next regular payday. The bill provides an exception. The bill provides that bonuses and fringe benefits are not covered. The bill reduces the amount of liquidated damages available. The bill provides an instance when liquidated damages are not available. The bill clarifies that the section does not address whether overtime pay is due. The bill authorizes payment by mail if requested by the employee.
Title
Relating to payment of separated employee's outstanding wages
Sponsors
Sen. Mitch Carmichael [R] | Sen. Donna Boley [R] | Sen. Ryan Ferns [R] | Sen. Ed Gaunch [R] |
Sen. Daniel Hall [D] | Sen. Mike Hall [R] | Sen. Robert Karnes [R] | Sen. Jeffrey Mullins [R] |
Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] | Sen. David Nohe [R] | Sen. Charles Trump [R] | Sen. Craig Blair [R] |
Sen. William Cole [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-13 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 32) (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 506) (Y: 68 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 506) (Y: 68 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Chapter 152, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/31/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/31/15 |
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by Governor 3/31/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | House | To Governor 3/23/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/23/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-23 | Senate | To Governor 3/23/15 |
2015-03-14 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 32) |
2015-03-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-13 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-03-13 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 506) |
2015-03-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-13 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-03-13 | House | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice) |
2015-03-13 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2015-03-13 | House | Amendment withdrawn (Voice vote) |
2015-03-13 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2015-03-13 | House | On 3rd reading with restricted right to amend, Special Calender |
2015-03-12 | House | Amendment pending |
2015-03-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-12 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-11 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-03-11 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-10 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2015-02-19 | House | To House Finance |
2015-02-19 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2015-01-26 | House | To House Industry and Labor |
2015-01-26 | House | To Industry and Labor then Finance |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-01-23 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-01-22 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-01-21 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2015-01-14 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-01-14 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
hb2012 (Same As) 2015-01-14 - To House Industry and Labor
SB102 (Similar To) 2015-01-14 - To Judiciary
SB102 (Similar To) 2015-01-14 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 5 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |