WV SB1037 | 2019 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Approved by Governor 5/29/19 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Approved by Governor 5/29/19 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating generally to medical cannabis
Title
Relating generally to medical cannabis
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 814) (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 813) (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 812) (Y: 37 N: 61 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-20 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 811) (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Motion to dispence reference, take up for immediate consideration and read a first time adopted (Roll No. 810) (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 38) (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 38) (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 37) (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 813) (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 812) (Y: 37 N: 61 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-20 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 811) (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Motion to dispence reference, take up for immediate consideration and read a first time adopted (Roll No. 810) (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 38) (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 38) (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 37) (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-01 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/29/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/29/19 |
2019-06-01 | Senate | To Governor 5/24/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-05-24 | Senate | To Governor 5/24/19 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-05-20 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-05-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-05-20 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 814) |
2019-05-20 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 813) |
2019-05-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 812) |
2019-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 811) |
2019-05-20 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-05-20 | House | Motion to dispence reference, take up for immediate consideration and read a first time adopted (Roll No. 810) |
2019-05-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 38) |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Title amendment adopted |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 38) |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 37) |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB105 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - Tabled
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16A | 10 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16A | 11 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16A | 15 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16A | 16 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16A | 2 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16A | 4 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16A | 6 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16A | 6 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16A | 7 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16A | 8 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16A | 9 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16A | 9 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16A | 9 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |