WV SB1019 | 2019 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Approved by Governor 5/28/19 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Approved by Governor 5/28/19 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Supplementing, amending, decreasing, and increasing existing appropriations from State Road Fund to DOH for fiscal year ending June 30, 2020
Title
Supplementing, amending, decreasing, and increasing existing appropriations from State Road Fund to DOH for fiscal year ending June 30, 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 806) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 805) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 804) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 21) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 20) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 805) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 804) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 21) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 20) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-01 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/28/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/28/19 |
2019-06-01 | Senate | To Governor 5/24/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-05-24 | Senate | To Governor 5/24/19 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-05-20 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-05-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-05-20 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 806) |
2019-05-20 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 805) |
2019-05-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 804) |
2019-05-20 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-05-20 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-05-20 | House | Reference dispensed |
2019-05-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 21) |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 21) |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 20) |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB121 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - To House Finance