WV SB1014 | 2024 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Chapter 13, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Chapter 13, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to clarify political party procedure and authority to nominate presidential electors.
Title
Clarifying procedure for political party nomination of presidential electors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-20 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 798) (Y: 81 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 797) (Y: 80 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 796) (Y: 14 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2024-05-20 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 795) (Y: 82 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-05-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 14) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-19 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 13) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 797) (Y: 80 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 796) (Y: 14 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2024-05-20 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 795) (Y: 82 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-05-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 14) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-19 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 13) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | Senate | Chapter 13, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2024 |
2024-05-21 | House | Approved by Governor 5/24/2024 - House Journal |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/24/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/24/2024 |
2024-05-23 | House | To Governor 5/22/2024 - House Journal |
2024-05-21 | Senate | To Governor 5/22/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-05-22 | Senate | To Governor 5/22/2024 |
2024-05-20 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-05-20 | House | Completed legislative action |
2024-05-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-05-20 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 798) |
2024-05-20 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 797) |
2024-05-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-05-20 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 796) |
2024-05-20 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-05-20 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 795) |
2024-05-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-05-20 | House | Immediate consideration |
2024-05-20 | House | Reference dispensed |
2024-05-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-05-20 | House | House received Senate message |
2024-05-19 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-05-19 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 14) |
2024-05-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 14) |
2024-05-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-05-19 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 13) |
2024-05-19 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-05-19 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-05-19 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2024-05-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-05-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB114 (Similar To) 2024-05-21 - On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 5 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |