WV SB1005 | 2014 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Chapter 4, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Chapter 4, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing salary increase for county commissioners and elected county officials
Title
Authorizing salary increase for county commissioners and elected county officials
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-14 - House - Effective date rejected (Roll No. 528) (Y: 64 N: 25 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 527) (Y: 56 N: 33 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 526) (Y: 31 N: 58 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-14 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 525) (Y: 34 N: 55 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-14 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 524) (Y: 84 N: 5 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 2) (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 1) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 527) (Y: 56 N: 33 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 526) (Y: 31 N: 58 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-14 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 525) (Y: 34 N: 55 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-14 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 524) (Y: 84 N: 5 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 2) (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 1) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | Senate | Chapter 4, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2014 |
2014-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 3/31/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/31/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/31/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/27/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-27 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/14 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Effective ninety days from passage |
2014-03-14 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-14 | House | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-14 | House | Effective date rejected (Roll No. 528) |
2014-03-14 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 527) |
2014-03-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-14 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 526) |
2014-03-14 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 525) |
2014-03-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-14 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 524) |
2014-03-14 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-03-14 | House | Immediate consideration |
2014-03-14 | House | Reference dispensed |
2014-03-14 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 2) |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 1) |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2014-03-14 | Senate | To Finance |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-03-14 | Senate | To Finance |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
7 | 7 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 7 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |