WV SB100 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-16 - Approved by Governor 3/14/12 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-16 - Approved by Governor 3/14/12 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to alter the mandatory nature of certain fee collections and to remove the requirement that the circuit court charge three times the amount of actual postage when mailing documents.
Title
Relating to fees collected by circuit court clerks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 219) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 219) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/14/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-15 | Approved by Governor 3/14/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-14 | Approved by Governor 3/14/12 | |
2012-03-10 | To Governor 3/9/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-09 | To Governor 3/9/12 | |
2012-03-10 | To Governor 3/9/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-05 | House received Senate message | |
2012-03-05 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-05 | Communicated to House | |
2012-03-05 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) | |
2012-03-05 | Senate concurred in House title amendment (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-05 | House Message received | |
2012-03-02 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-03-02 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-02 | Passed House (Roll No. 219) | |
2012-03-02 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-02 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-03-01 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-01 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-02-29 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-29 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2012-02-28 | Do pass | |
2012-01-25 | To House Judiciary | |
2012-01-25 | To Judiciary | |
2012-01-25 | Introduced in House | |
2012-01-24 | Ordered to House | |
2012-01-24 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) | |
2012-01-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-01-24 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-01-23 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-01-23 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-01-20 | Read 1st time | |
2012-01-20 | On 1st reading | |
2012-01-19 | Committee substitute reported | |
2012-01-11 | To Judiciary | |
2012-01-11 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-01-11 | To Judiciary | |
2012-01-11 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |