WV HJR104 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-12 - Senate requests House to concur
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-12 - Senate requests House to concur
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this resolution is to amend the constitution to prevent any person from serving in the office of Secretary of State, Auditor, Treasurer, Commissioner of Agriculture, or Attorney General for more than three consecutive terms beginning after January 1, 2025.
Title
Providing Term Limits for certain Constitutional Officers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-12 - Senate - Adopted by Senate with amended title (Roll No. 541) (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Roll No. 317) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 315) (Y: 23 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2022-03-01 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 314) (Y: 20 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-03-02 - House - Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Roll No. 317) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 315) (Y: 23 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2022-03-01 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 314) (Y: 20 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-12 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Adopted by Senate with amended title (Roll No. 541) |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-12 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Reported be adopted, with amendment and title amendment |
2022-03-03 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-03-03 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Roll No. 317) |
2022-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-02 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 315) |
2022-03-01 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 314) |
2022-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-01 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-28 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-28 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-25 | House | Be adopted |
2022-01-21 | House | To House Judiciary |
2022-01-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-21 | House | To Judiciary |
2022-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |