WV HCR86 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Passed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Passed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting study of municipal and county governments for efficiencies and economies of scale
Title
Requesting study of municipal and county governments for efficiencies and economies of scale
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2019-03-07 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2019-03-07 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2019-03-06 | House | Be adopted |
2019-03-01 | House | To House Rules |
2019-03-01 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2019-03-01 | House | Originating in House Government Organization |