WV HCR85 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
World War II Veterans Toothman Brothers Memorial Bridge
Title
World War II Veterans Toothman Brothers Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
Del. Phil Mallow [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2021-04-06 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-04-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-04-05 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2021-04-05 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2021-04-05 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2021-04-02 | House | Be adopted |
2021-04-01 | House | To House Rules |
2021-04-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-04-01 | House | To Rules |
2021-04-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HCR52 (Similar To) 2021-04-06 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
HCR52 (Similar To) 2021-04-06 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
HCR52 (Similar To) 2021-04-06 - To Transportation and Infrastructure