WV HCR65 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-02 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-02 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway
Title
Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway
Sponsors
Del. Roy Cooper [R] | Del. Jeffrey Pack [R] | Del. Joe Jeffries [R] | Del. Tom Bibby [R] |
Del. John Hardy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-02 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2019-03-02 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2019-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-03-02 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-01 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-01 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2019-03-01 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2019-02-28 | House | Be adopted |
2019-02-26 | House | To House Rules |
2019-02-26 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2019-02-12 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2019-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-12 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Rules |
2019-02-12 | House | Filed for introduction |