WV HCR62 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
USMC Cpl Guy Maywood Edwards Memorial Bridge
Title
USMC Cpl Guy Maywood Edwards Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2020-02-20 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-19 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-19 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2020-02-19 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2020-02-18 | House | Be adopted |
2020-02-14 | House | To House Rules |
2020-02-14 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2020-02-04 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2020-02-04 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-04 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Rules |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |