WV HCR62 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-09 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-09 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Summary
Requesting a study of the costs and benefits of the creation of an exemption for social security benefits regarding personal income taxes
Title
Requesting a study of the costs and benefits of the creation of an exemption for social security benefits regarding personal income taxes
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-09 | To Finance | |
2010-03-09 | To Finance then Rules | |
2010-03-09 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-03-08 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-08 | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-08 | Reported by the Clerk | |
2010-03-08 | From House Calendar, Unf. Business, to Special Calendar | |
2010-03-05 | Be adopted | |
2010-02-18 | To House Rules | |
2010-02-18 | Be adopted, but first to Rules | |
2010-02-18 | Originating in House Senior Citizen Issues |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Resolution_History.cfm?year=2010&sessiontype=RS&input4=62&billtype=CR&houseorig=H&btype=res |