WV HCR57 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-08 - House received Senate message
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-08 - House received Senate message
Summary
The "Denver Ray Gandee Sr. Bridge"
Title
The "Denver Ray Gandee Sr. Bridge"
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Ashley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-08 | House received Senate message | |
2008-03-08 | Completed legislative action | |
2008-03-08 | Communicated to House | |
2008-03-08 | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) | |
2008-03-08 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-03-08 | Reported be adopted | |
2008-02-25 | To Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2008-02-25 | To Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2008-02-25 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-02-22 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-22 | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) | |
2008-02-22 | Reported by the Clerk | |
2008-02-22 | From House Calendar, Unf. Business, to Special Calendar | |
2008-02-21 | Be adopted | |
2008-02-19 | To House Rules | |
2008-02-19 | Introduced in House | |
2008-02-19 | To Rules | |
2008-02-19 | Filed for introduction |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Resolution_History.cfm?year=2008&sessiontype=RS&input4=57&billtype=CR&houseorig=H&btype=res |