WV HCR55 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-04 - House received Senate message
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-04 - House received Senate message
Summary
The "PVT. Clyde Whitman (Bobbie) Bennett and PFC Oliver Ball, Jr. Memorial Bridge"
Title
The "PVT. Clyde Whitman (Bobbie) Bennett and PFC Oliver Ball, Jr. Memorial Bridge"
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | House received Senate message | |
2011-03-03 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-03-03 | Communicated to House | |
2011-03-03 | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-03 | Immediate consideration | |
2011-03-03 | Reported be adopted | |
2011-02-14 | To Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2011-02-14 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-02-14 | House Message received | |
2011-02-11 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-02-11 | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) | |
2011-02-11 | Reported by the Clerk | |
2011-02-11 | From House Calendar, Unf. Business, to Special Calendar | |
2011-02-10 | Be adopted | |
2011-02-08 | To House Rules | |
2011-02-08 | Introduced in House | |
2011-02-08 | To Rules | |
2011-02-08 | Filed for introduction |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Resolution_History.cfm?year=2011&sessiontype=RS&input4=55&billtype=CR&houseorig=H&btype=res |