WV HCR47 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
U. S. Army SPC 4 William L. Amos Memorial Bridge
Title
U. S. Army SPC 4 William L. Amos Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
Del. Rodney Miller [D] | Del. Jim Butler [R] | Del. Zachery Maynard [R] | Del. Michael Brewer [D] |
Del. Chad Lovejoy [D] | Del. Jeff Eldridge [D] | Del. Matthew Rohrbach [R] | Del. Charles Romine [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2018-02-26 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2018-02-26 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-26 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-23 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-23 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2018-02-23 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2018-02-23 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2018-02-22 | House | Be adopted |
2018-02-06 | House | To House Rules |
2018-02-06 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-06 | House | To Rules |
2018-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |