WV HCR47 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-07 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-07 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
U. S. Army CPL Wilson B. Lambert, Jr. Memorial Road
Title
U. S. Army CPL Wilson B. Lambert, Jr. Memorial Road
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-07 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2017-04-07 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-04-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-06 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2017-04-06 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2017-04-06 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2017-04-05 | House | Be adopted |
2017-04-04 | House | To House Rules |
2017-04-04 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2017-03-02 | House | To House Roads and Transportation |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-02 | House | To Roads and Transportation then Rules |
2017-03-02 | House | Filed for introduction |