CA SB803 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-25 - June 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-25 - June 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 6 (commencing with Section 11310) of Chapter 5 of Division 10 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances.
Title
Heal Our Heroes Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Becker [D] | Sen. Brian Jones [R] | Asm. Marie Waldron [R] | Sen. Bob Archuleta [D] |
Sen. Toni Atkins [D] | Asm. Isaac Bryan [D] | Asm. Heath Flora [R] | Asm. Matt Haney [D] |
Asm. Evan Low [D] | Asm. Josh Lowenthal [D] | Asm. Anthony Rendon [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Special Consent SB803 Becker (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Special Consent SB803 Becker (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-25 | Assembly | June 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-06-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-06-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Santiago. |
2023-09-11 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Bryan. |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (September 1). |
2023-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-07-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-22 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2023-06-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1365.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1184.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | April 24 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 657.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11310 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |