WV HCR45 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-12 - Completed legislative action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-12 - Completed legislative action
Summary
Conducting a study on the educational and communication barriers facing children in West Virginia who are deaf or hard of hearing and their families
Title
Conducting a study on the educational and communication barriers facing children in West Virginia who are deaf or hard of hearing and their families
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-12 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-03-12 | Communicated to House | |
2011-03-12 | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-12 | Immediate consideration | |
2011-03-12 | 2nd reference dispensed | |
2011-03-12 | Reported be adopted, but first to Rules | |
2011-03-11 | To Health and Human Resources | |
2011-03-11 | To Health and Human Resources then Rules | |
2011-03-11 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-03-10 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-10 | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-10 | Reported by the Clerk | |
2011-03-10 | From House Calendar, Unf. Business, to Special Calendar | |
2011-03-09 | Be adopted | |
2011-02-04 | To House Rules | |
2011-02-04 | Be adopted, but first to Rules | |
2011-02-04 | Originating in House Education |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Resolution_History.cfm?year=2011&sessiontype=RS&input4=45&billtype=CR&houseorig=H&btype=res |