WV HCR31 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-05 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-05 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Applying to the Congress of the United States to call a convention of states
Title
Applying to the Congress of the United States to call a convention of states
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - House - Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Roll No. 365) (Y: 77 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Motion for previous question rejected (Roll No. 364) (Y: 22 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-03-04 - House - Motion for previous question rejected (Roll No. 364) (Y: 22 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-03-04 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-04 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Roll No. 365) |
2022-03-04 | House | Motion for previous question rejected (Roll No. 364) |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2022-03-04 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2022-03-03 | House | Be adopted |
2022-03-01 | House | To House Rules |
2022-03-01 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2022-01-27 | House | To House Judiciary |
2022-01-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-27 | House | To Judiciary then Rules |
2022-01-27 | House | Filed for introduction |