WV HCR3 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-14 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-14 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The "Army Captain Thomas McElwain Memorial Bridge"
Title
The "Army Captain Thomas McElwain Memorial Bridge"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-14 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-02-14 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-02-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-02-13 | House | Adopted by House, Daily Calendar (Voice vote) |
2014-02-13 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2014-02-13 | House | On Unfinished Business, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-12 | House | By substitute, be adopted |
2014-01-09 | House | To House Rules |
2014-01-09 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-01-09 | House | To Rules |
2014-01-09 | House | Filed for introduction |