WV HCR17 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
James C. Vickers Silver Star Highway
Title
U. S. Army SSG James C. Vickers Highway
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2021-03-27 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-26 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2021-03-26 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2021-03-26 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2021-03-25 | House | By substitute, be adopted |
2021-03-19 | House | To House Rules |
2021-03-19 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2021-03-02 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2021-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-02 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Rules |
2021-03-02 | House | Filed for introduction |