WV HCR110 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-07 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Speaker Clyde M. See, Jr. Exit

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Speaker Clyde M. See, Jr. Exit

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-07SenateCompleted legislative action
2020-03-07SenateCommunicated to House
2020-03-07SenateAdopted by Senate (Voice vote)
2020-03-07SenateCommittee reference dispensed
2020-03-07SenateImmediate consideration
2020-03-07SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-03-06HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-03-06HouseAdopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote)
2020-03-06HouseReported by the Clerk
2020-03-06HouseOn Unfinished Business, Special Calendar
2020-03-05HouseBe adopted
2020-03-04HouseTo House Rules
2020-03-04HouseBe adopted, but first to Rules
2020-02-25HouseTo House Technology and Infrastructure
2020-02-25HouseIntroduced in House
2020-02-25HouseTo Technology and Infrastructure then Rules
2020-02-25HouseFiled for introduction

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback