WV HCR106 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - To Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - To Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting a study on how to best use the additional severance tax collections attributed to the production of natural gas
Title
Requesting a study on how to best use the additional severance tax collections attributed to the production of natural gas
Sponsors
Del. Thomas Campbell [D] | Del. Samuel Cann [D] | Sen. Ryan Ferns [R] | Del. Charlene Marshall [D] |
Del. Don Perdue [D] | Del. David Pethtel [D] | Del. Scott Varner [D] | Del. Harry White [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-10 | To Rules | |
2012-03-10 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-03-09 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-03-09 | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-09 | Reported by the Clerk | |
2012-03-09 | From House Calendar, Unf. Business, to Special Calendar | |
2012-03-08 | Be adopted | |
2012-03-07 | To House Rules | |
2012-03-07 | Introduced in House | |
2012-03-07 | To Rules | |
2012-03-07 | Filed for introduction |