WV HCR104 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - To Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - To Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting that the Joint Committee on Government and Finance study the composition, qualifications, terms and duties of the State Board of Education
Title
Requesting that the Joint Committee on Government and Finance study the composition, qualifications, terms and duties of the State Board of Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | To Rules |
2016-03-10 | Senate | To Rules |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-09 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2016-03-09 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2016-03-09 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2016-03-08 | House | Be adopted |
2016-03-07 | House | To House Rules |
2016-03-07 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2016-03-07 | House | Originating in House Education |