WV HB5594 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Chapter 153, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Chapter 153, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting West Virginia University and Marshall University from contracts, agreements, or memorandums of understanding with spending units in state government with exceptions
Title
Exempting the West Virginia School of Osteopathic Medicine, West Virginia University and Marshall University from contracts, agreements, or memorandums of understanding with spending units in state government with exceptions.
Sponsors
Del. Roger Hanshaw [R] | Del. Geno Chiarelli [R] | Del. Debbie Warner [R] | Del. Joseph Statler [R] |
Del. John Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 420) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 390) (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 390) (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Chapter 153, Acts, Regular Session, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/24 - House Journal |
2024-03-27 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/24 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/21/2024 - House Journal |
2024-03-21 | House | To Governor 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 420) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2024-02-29 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2024-02-29 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-28 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-02-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 390) |
2024-02-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-28 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-02-28 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-02-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-26 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-26 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-23 | House | Do pass |
2024-02-12 | House | To House Finance |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-12 | House | To Finance |
2024-02-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5A | 3 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |