WV HB5425 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to add experience needed for principals to apply and to grant waivers of experience required in employment of professional education personnel if nobody applies with the experience needed.
Title
Relating to clarifying the amount of experience required in the hiring of professional education personnel
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 331) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | To Education |
2024-02-28 | Senate | To Education |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-27 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-27 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 331) |
2024-02-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-27 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-26 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-23 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-23 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2024-02-02 | House | To House Education |
2024-02-02 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-02 | House | To Education |
2024-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18A | 4 | 7a | Amended Code | Citation Text |