WV HB4977 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-07 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-07 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expiring funds to the balance of the Department of Arts, Culture and History, Division of Culture and History, Public Records and Preservation Revenue Account Fund
Title
Expiring funds to the balance of the Department of Arts, Culture and History, Division of Culture and History, Public Records and Preservation Revenue Account Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2020-03-04 | House | From Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2020-03-04 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-03 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-03-03 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-02 | House | Do pass |
2020-03-02 | House | Originating in House Finance |