WV HB4960 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-07 - Communicated to House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-07 - Communicated to House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to exempting from licensure as an electrician
Title
Relating to exempting from licensure as an electrician
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - Senate - Rejected by Senate (Roll No. 577) (Y: 13 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2020-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 332) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 332) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Rejected by Senate (Roll No. 577) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Returned to calendar by Rules Committee |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Removed from calendar by Rules Committee |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 3/6/20 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 3/5/20 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Returned to calendar by Rules Committee |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Removed from calendar by Rules Committee |
2020-03-03 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-02-26 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-02-26 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 332) |
2020-02-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-21 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-20 | House | Do pass |
2020-02-20 | House | Originating in House Government Organization |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 3B | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |