WV HB4847 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 250, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 250, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to missing persons generally
Title
Relating to missing persons generally
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-12 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 660) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 492) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 351) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 492) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 351) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Chapter 250, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-28 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-24 | House | To Governor 3/24/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/24/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/24/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-12 | House | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 660) |
2022-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Title amendment adopted |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 492) |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-12 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2022-03-03 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-03-03 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 351) |
2022-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-02 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-01 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-28 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-28 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-25 | House | Do pass |
2022-02-25 | House | Originating in House Judiciary |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 3D | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 3D | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |