WV HB4814 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Chapter 160, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Chapter 160, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to extend the reporting and sunset dates of the State Advisory Council on Postsecondary Attainment Goals.
Title
Relating to extending the reporting and sunset dates of the State Advisory Council on Postsecondary Attainment Goals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 321) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 48) (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 48) (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Chapter 160, Acts, Regular Session, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/24 - House Journal |
2024-03-27 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/24 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/21/2024 - House Journal |
2024-03-21 | House | To Governor 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-01 | House | House received Senate message |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 321) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-29 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-28 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2024-01-29 | Senate | To Education |
2024-01-29 | Senate | To Education |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-01-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-01-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 48) |
2024-01-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-01-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-01-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-01-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-01-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-01-24 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-01-23 | House | Do pass |
2024-01-16 | House | To House Education |
2024-01-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-16 | House | To Education |
2024-01-16 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18B | 1D | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |