WV HB4768 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Chapter 159, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Chapter 159, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to increase the number of out-of-state medical students receiving in-state tuition rates who agree to practice for a specific time within West Virginia from two to four program participants per medical school.
Title
Relating to increasing the number of out-of-state medical students receiving in-state tuition rates who agree to practice for a specific time within West Virginia.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 368) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 30) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 30) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Chapter 159, Acts, Regular Session, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/22/2024 - House Journal |
2024-03-22 | House | Approved by Governor 3/22/2024 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/22/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/13/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/13/2024 - House Journal |
2024-03-13 | House | To Governor 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 368) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-05 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2024-02-16 | Senate | To Finance |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2024-01-26 | Senate | To Education |
2024-01-26 | Senate | To Education then Finance |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-01-24 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-01-24 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 30) |
2024-01-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-01-24 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-01-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-01-23 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-01-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-01-22 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-01-19 | House | Do pass |
2024-01-16 | House | To House Education |
2024-01-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-16 | House | To Education |
2024-01-16 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18C | 3 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |