WV HB4758 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to create a legislative select committee, require annual reports, create criminal penalties, and clarify the duties and functions of the Fusion Center.
Title
Creation of the Joint Oversight Committee on the Fusion Center
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 137) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2024-02-13 | Senate | To Government Organization then Judiciary |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-09 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 137) |
2024-02-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-09 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-08 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-07 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-07 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-06 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2024-01-17 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2024-01-15 | House | To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security |
2024-01-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-15 | House | To Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security then Judiciary |
2024-01-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15A | 12 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15A | 12 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15A | 12 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15A | 12 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15A | 12 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15A | 12 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |