WV HB4676 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 179, Acts, 2008
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 179, Acts, 2008
Summary
This bill would continue the permissible appropriation of Public Employees Insurance Reserve Fund moneys to the bureau for medical services of the Department of Health and Human Resources.
Title
Continuing the permissible appropriation of Public Employees Insurance Reserve Fund moneys to the bureau for medical services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-08 | Chapter 179, Acts, 2008 | |
2008-03-12 | Approved by Governor 3/12/08 | |
2008-03-14 | Approved by Governor 3/12/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-13 | Approved by Governor 3/12/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-08 | To Governor 3/7/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-07 | To Governor 3/7/08 | |
2008-03-07 | To Governor 3/7/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-04 | House Message received | |
2008-02-29 | Completed legislative action | |
2008-03-03 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-03-03 | Effective July 1, 2008 (Roll No. 249) | |
2008-03-03 | House concurred in Senate effective date (Voice) | |
2008-03-03 | House received Senate message | |
2008-02-29 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2008-02-29 | Effective July 1, 2008 (Roll No. 4) | |
2008-02-29 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) | |
2008-02-29 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-02-29 | On 3rd reading | |
2008-02-28 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-28 | On 2nd reading | |
2008-02-27 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-27 | On 1st reading | |
2008-02-27 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-02-27 | Committee reference dispensed | |
2008-02-27 | Unanimous consent | |
2008-02-27 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-02-26 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-26 | Passed House (Roll No. 215) | |
2008-02-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-02-26 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-25 | From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2008-02-24 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-24 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-02-24 | Do pass | |
2008-02-18 | To House Finance | |
2008-02-18 | Introduced in House | |
2008-02-18 | To Finance | |
2008-02-18 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB769 (Same As) 2008-02-27 - To House Finance
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4676&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |