WV HB4661 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 307, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 307, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the powers of the Public Service Commission and the regulation of natural gas utilities
Title
Relating to the powers of the Public Service Commission and the regulation of natural gas utilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 346) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 132) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 132) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Chapter 307, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-03 | House | To Governor 3/3/20 |
2020-03-03 | House | To Governor 3/3/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-03 | Senate | To Governor 3/3/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-02-28 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 346) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 2/26/20 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 2/25/20 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 2/24/20 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-02-11 | Senate | To Energy, Industry, and Mining |
2020-02-11 | Senate | To Energy, Industry, and Mining |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 132) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-10 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-05 | House | Do pass |
2020-02-03 | House | To House Energy |
2020-02-03 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-03 | House | To Energy |
2020-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 4c | Amended Code | Citation Text |
24 | 3 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |